IL SB2929 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Language Assistance Services Act. Provides that a hospital that services an area where a language other than English is spoken by 10% or more of the service area's population must have a translator who speaks that language on staff during all hours that the hospital is open.
Title
LANGUAGE ASSISTANCE SRVCS-HOSP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-05-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-010-000 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 5-1(b)(1), Senator Martinez to present the bill on 3rd Reading. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-002-000 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 87 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |