IL SB3009 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cemetery Association Act. Provides that the board of trustees of a cemetery located in DuPage, Kane, Kendall, Lake, McHenry, or Will county shall provide notice of vacancies to the presiding officer of the township in which the cemetery is located rather than to the presiding officer of the county. Provides that the presiding officer so notified shall appoint a person to fill the vacancy.
Title
CEMETERY-VACANCY-NOTICE-TWP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 320 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |