IL SB3090 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that commitment to the Department of Juvenile Justice shall only be entered at the original sentencing hearing where the juvenile was found guilty of a felony offense, and not as a sentence for revocation of probation. Provides that the length of commitment to the Department of Juvenile Justice shall be proportionate to the underlying offense, and proportionate to sentences for minors who are similarly situated.
Title
JUV COURT-DEPT JUV JUSTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3090&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3090.htm |