IL SB3396 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that individuals licensed pursuant to the following Acts who have been actively licensed for 10 or more consecutive years with no prior disciplinary action or pending disciplinary proceedings shall be deemed compliant with continuing education requirements upon completion of half the number of hours required by the individual licensing Act or administrative rule: the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985; the Electrologist Licensing Act; the Environmental Health Practitioner Licensing Act; the Funeral Directors and Embalmers Licensing Code; the Illinois Landscape Architecture Act of 1989; the Illinois Professional Land Surveyor Act of 1989; and the Illinois Certified Shorthand Reporters Act of 1984. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall provide either a certified shorthand reporter or electronic recording means (rather than only a certified shorthand reporter) to take down the testimony and preserve a record of all proceedings at the hearing of any case in which a license may be revoked or subjected to other disciplinary action. Specifies that if an electronic recording is used by the Department, the electronic recording shall serve as the official record of the proceeding and may not be transcribed unless requested and paid for by the party requesting transcription, except as otherwise provided by law. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
DFPR-CONTINUING ED/TRANSCRIPTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2105 | 2105-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2105 | 2105-16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2105 | 60f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3396&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3396.htm |