IL SB3712 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Title Insurance Act. Excludes a limited liability company from the requirement that every title insurance agent registration applicant must be 18 years or more of age. Provides that included in every application for registration by a title insurance company, including a firm, partnership, association, limited liability company, or corporation, shall be an affidavit, signed and notarized in front of a notary public, affirming that the applicant and any owner, officer, director, principal, member, or manager has never been convicted or pled guilty to any felony or misdemeanor involving a crime of theft or dishonesty. Provides that no person who has had a conviction or pled guilty to any felony or misdemeanor involving theft or dishonesty shall be registered by a title insurance company, and no such person may serve as an owner, officer, director, principal, or manager of any registered title insurance agent. Includes additional factors whereby the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation may refuse to grant or may suspend or revoke any certificate of authority, registration, or license issued pursuant to the Act or impose a fine for a violation of the Act. Effective January 1, 2013.
Title
TITLE INS-AGENTS-REGISTRATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 010-000-000 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 155 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 155 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |