LA HB609 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Removes geographic limitations on the legislature's authority to create new school boards and on provisions relative to financing education (EG SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Removes geographic limitations on the legislature's authority to create new school boards and on provisions relative to financing education (EG SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 609, FINAL PASSAGE (#765) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | |
2012-05-09 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 44. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. | |
2012-05-09 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-05-03 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Notice given. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-04-26 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2012. | |
2012-04-25 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-24 | Reported without amendments (8-0) (Regular). | |
2012-04-19 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2012-04-18 | Reported with amendments (11-6) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-01 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled. |