LA HB854 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Becomes HB 1165.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Becomes HB 1165.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to types of motor vehicles that are required to be covered by an automobile liability policy pursuant to the Compulsory Motor Vehicle Liability Security Law
Title
Provides relative to types of motor vehicles that are required to be covered by an automobile liability policy pursuant to the Compulsory Motor Vehicle Liability Security Law
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Huval [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Becomes HB 1165. |
2016-05-10 | House | Reported by substitute (9-0). |
2016-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Insurance. |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Insurance. |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |