LA HB854 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to free parking for disabled veterans at airports
Title
Provides relative to free parking for disabled veterans at airports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 854 ADOPT (#1397) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 854 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1404) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 854 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1324) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 854 FINAL PASSAGE (#1200) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 854 FINAL PASSAGE (#476) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 854 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1404) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 854 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1324) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 854 FINAL PASSAGE (#1200) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 854 FINAL PASSAGE (#476) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 705. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-17 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Horton, Terry Landry, and Seabaugh. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, Hewitt, and Bishop. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18. |
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |