LA SB200 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 19 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 19 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the issuance of certain permits to create or convert a solution mined cavern for storage purposes. (gov sig)
Title
Prohibits the issuance of certain permits to create or convert a solution mined cavern for storage purposes. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 200 FINAL PASSAGE (#483) (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 200 FINAL PASSAGE (#288) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 200 FINAL PASSAGE (#288) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 19 nays. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 15 yeas and 20 nays. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |