MA H1008 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4266
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the annual reporting of patient safety by health care providers. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to patient safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4266 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-03-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/24/2014 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-05-28 | Joint | Hearing postponed |
2013-05-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H4266 (Replaced by) 2014-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H4141
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1008 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1008.pdf |