MA H1063 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to corporate disclosures. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to corporate disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H98 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3842 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3842 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1063 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1063.pdf |