MA H1092 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4975
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to healthcare coverage for early and periodic screening, diagnosis and treatment services for children and adolescents. Financial Services.
Title
To provide early and periodic screening, diagnosis and treatment to privately insured children under the age of 21
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4975 |
2021-11-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2583 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S640 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S726 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2856
H2573 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
S634 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S733 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1760 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S666 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S667 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H4975 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2583 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S640 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S726 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2856
H2573 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
S634 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S733 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1760 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S666 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S667 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H4975 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1092 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1092.pdf |