MA H1330 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4694
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide scholarships for the cost of tuition and fees for certain non-first year students at public colleges or universities. Higher Education.
Title
To establish a finish line grant program to encourage college completion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4694 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1326 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
S1741 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2716
S1903 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1220 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S1864 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S856 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H4694 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S835 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1741 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2716
S1903 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1220 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S1864 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S856 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H4694 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S835 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1330 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1330.pdf |