MA H1438 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the protection of vulnerable adults from sexual assault committed by mandated reporters, persons in a position of trust and providers of transportation. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the protection of vulnerable adults from sexual assault committed by mandated reporters, persons in a position of trust and providers of transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
H1436 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1898 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
S736 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
S764 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
S1307 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2692
S844 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2491
H4281 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
H1436 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1898 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
S736 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
S764 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
S1307 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2692
S844 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2491
H4281 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1438 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1438.pdf |