MA H1461 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Department of Mental Health as the oversight agency for the mental health system within the state prison system. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to ensuring quality mental health services in state correctional facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2098 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
S2528 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1267 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2063 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2514 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2528
S2528 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1267 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2063 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1461 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1461.pdf |