MA H1603 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4624
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to transfer the jurisdiction of the towns of Danvers and Middleton from the Salem District Court to the Peabody District Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the jurisdiction of Peabody District Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4624 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4624 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3093 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2416 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H534 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H3091 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Senate concurred
H956 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4198
H4754 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
H4760 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3093 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2416 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H534 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H3091 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Senate concurred
H956 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4198
H4754 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
H4760 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1603 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1603.pdf |