MA H1684 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4463
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to waivers in employment contracts. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Concerning waivers in employment contracts
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4463 |
2019-04-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1161 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S663 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1049 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4463 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S663 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1049 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4463 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1684 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1684.pdf |