MA H1720 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4481
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Velis of Westfield, a petition of John C. Velis and Donald F. Humason, Jr., that the commissioner of the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to transfer a certain parcel of land in the city of Westfield to the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner for construction purposes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Providing for transfers of land in Westfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4481 |
2017-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1754 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2017 from 02:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
H1106 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2017
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1102 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2018
H1718 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H1120 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2017
H3717 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3809
H3814 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
S2241 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 211 of the Acts of 2018
H4265 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2018
H4301 (Similar To) 2018-07-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2018
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1106 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2017
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1102 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2018
H1718 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H1120 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2017
H3717 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3809
H3814 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
S2241 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 211 of the Acts of 2018
H4265 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2018
H4301 (Similar To) 2018-07-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2018
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1720 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1720.pdf |