MA H1830 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize municipal use of the prudent investor standards. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing municipal use of the prudent investor standards
Sponsors
Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Rep. John Fernandes [D] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Thomas Calter [D] |
Rep. Michael Finn [D] | Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] | Rep. Joseph Wagner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-04-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1830 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1830.pdf |