MA H1844 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide collective bargaining rights to employees of the mosquito control projects and mosquito control districts. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To provide collective bargaining rights to employees of the mosquito control projects and mosquito control districts
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-01-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1844 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1844.pdf |