MA H1969 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4449
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow restaurants to donate edible leftover cooked food and nonperishable food to local food pantries and assistance shelters. Public Health.
Title
Relative to food donations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4449 |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1475 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1881 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1845 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S869 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S934 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
H1881 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1845 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S869 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S934 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1969 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1969.pdf |