MA H2015 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2016
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-23 - Published as amended, see H2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-23 - Published as amended, see H2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to Joint Rules governing the 2013-2014 legislative sessions (House, No. 2015). January 16, 2013.
Title
Joint Rules governing the 2013-2014 legislative sessions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-23 | House | Published as amended, see H2016 |
2013-01-23 | House | Order adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 10 adopted, as changed |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 17 adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 16 adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 15 adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 14 adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 13 adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 12 adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 11 adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 9 rejected 29 YEAS to 125 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 7) |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 7 rejected 29 YEAS to 126 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 6) |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 6 rejected 29 YEAS to 126 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 5) |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 4 rejected 29 YEAS to 126 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 4) |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 3 rejected, as changed 29 YEAS to 126 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 3) |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 2 rejected 29 YEAS to 126 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 2) |
2013-01-23 | House | Amendment 1 rejected 29 YEAS to 125 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 1) |
2013-01-22 | House | Postponed until the next sitting |
2013-01-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-01-22 | House | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2016 (Replaced by) 2013-03-14 - Senate concurred in the House amendment
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2015 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2015.pdf |