MA H2094 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure that health care policies and protocols not discriminate between patients with mental health or substance use conditions and patients with a medical or surgical conditions. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To ensure full system accountability for mental health parity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-07 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1038 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1041 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S675 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1276 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - New draft substituted, see S2572
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - H4879, published as amended
H1041 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S675 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1276 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - New draft substituted, see S2572
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - H4879, published as amended
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2094 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2094.pdf |