MA H2115 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4461
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further define affordable housing. Housing.
Title
To define affordable housing
Sponsors
Rep. John Fernandes [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Sen. Richard Moore [D] |
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4461 |
2011-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2011 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4461 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2115 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8250&generalCourtId=1 |