MA H2127 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5194
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study the availability of continuum of care for persons with substance use disorder. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the availability of a continuum of care for persons with substance use disorder
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5194 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1219 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1301 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
H2128 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1316 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
H2103 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H2102 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H5194 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1268 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1301 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
H2128 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1316 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
H2103 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H2102 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H5194 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1268 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2127 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2127.pdf |