MA H2168 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-14 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H3947
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-14 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H3947
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the charter of the city of Woburn to change the name of the members of the city council from "alderman" to "city councilor". Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To amend the charter of the city of Woburn to change the name of the members of the city council from "alderman" to "city councilor"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill, H3947 |
2021-07-14 | House | Read third |
2021-06-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-05-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-05-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2021 from 12:00 PM-12:01 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3947 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2021
H3981 (Similar To) 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2022
S41 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2021
H3823 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied S2448
H4230 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Consolidated with H4299
H3981 (Similar To) 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2022
S41 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2021
H3823 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied S2448
H4230 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Consolidated with H4299
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2168 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2168.pdf |