MA H2370 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to employees of the Civil Air Patrol and Coast Guard Auxiliary. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Protecting the employment benefits of Civil Air Patrol and Coast Guard Auxiliary members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1005 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3133 (Similar To) 2018-12-04 - New draft substituted, see H4988
H2514 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1370 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4988 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 338 of the Acts of 2018
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
H3133 (Similar To) 2018-12-04 - New draft substituted, see H4988
H2514 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1370 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4988 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 338 of the Acts of 2018
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2370 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2370.pdf |