MA H2484 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal certain tax exemptions for aircraft. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the repeal of the sales tax exemption for aircraft
Sponsors
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Maria Robinson [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] |
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1337 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2596 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1601 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1337 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2596 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1601 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2484 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2484.pdf |