MA H2783 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the public records law. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relating to the public records law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2019-12-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2689 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2782 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2782 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2783 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2783.pdf |