MA H2909 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to abandoned vessels on certain state property. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to abandoned vessels on DCR property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-09-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S1634 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3913
S1594 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2592 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3913
H1191 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4281
H1484 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S1594 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2592 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3913
H1191 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4281
H1484 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2909 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2909.pdf |