MA H3056 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act designating a certain section of State Highway Route 2 in the city of Cambridge and town of Arlington as the James M. Gavin Memorial Highway By Mr. Garballey of Arlington, a petition of Sean Garballey designating a certain section of State Highway Route 2 in the city of Cambridge and town of Arlington as the James M. Gavin Memorial Highway. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain section of State Highway Route 2 in the city of Cambridge and town of Arlington as the James M. Gavin Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-09-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3056 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3056.pdf |