MA H3091 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to establishing an active streets certification program within the Department of Transportation to encourage walking, cycling, and the use of public transportation in municipalities. Transportation.
Title
Relative to active streets and healthy communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4443 |
2014-02-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4443 (Replaced by) 2014-09-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3091 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3091.pdf |