MA H3133 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4988
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-04 - New draft substituted, see H4988
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-04 - New draft substituted, see H4988
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the total benefits that may be paid to certain persons locked out of their usual place of employment. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To protect locked out employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-04 | House | New draft substituted, see H4988 |
2018-12-04 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2018-12-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-12-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2018-12-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4988 |
2018-04-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1005 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2370 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2514 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1370 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4988 (Replaced by) 2018-12-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 338 of the Acts of 2018
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
H2370 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2514 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1370 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4988 (Replaced by) 2018-12-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 338 of the Acts of 2018
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3133 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3133.pdf |