MA H3213 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt veterans from civil service exam fees. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Exempting veterans from civil service exam fees
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Rep. John Lawn [D] | Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] |
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-03-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3213 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3213.pdf |