MA H3253 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4309
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to lease a certain parcel of land in the city of Gardner to Heywood Healthcare Inc. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the leasing of a certain parcel of land in the city of Gardner
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4309 |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3941 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1933 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1039 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1933
H4309 (Replaced by) 2022-07-06 - New draft substituted, see H4980
H4980 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2022
H1933 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1039 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1933
H4309 (Replaced by) 2022-07-06 - New draft substituted, see H4980
H4980 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3253 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3253.pdf |