MA H329 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4141
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the formula for district reimbursement through the special education circuit breaker. Education.
Title
Relative to increasing special education circuit breaker and regional transportation reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4141 |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4141 (Replaced by) 2016-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2719 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1217 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1216 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4362
H2456 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H627 (Similar To) 2016-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
H2719 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1217 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1216 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4362
H2456 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H627 (Similar To) 2016-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H329 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H329.pdf |