MA H3418 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4519
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the allocation of funds received by the Attorney General through third party settlements. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the allocation of settlement funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4519 |
2012-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Weymouth Town Hall |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4519 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3418 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14407&generalCourtId=1 |