MA H3881 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Chelmsford to lease a certain parcel of land in said town for agricultural purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Chelmsford to lease Sunny Meadow Farm
Sponsors
Rep. James Arciero [D] | Sen. Susan Fargo [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Thomas Golden [D] |
Rep. David Nangle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #270 [35 YEAS to 0 NAYS] |
2012-07-25 | House | Enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 322) |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-07-12 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-06-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-04-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-03-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-03-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/29/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-01-12 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3881 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17787&generalCourtId=1 |