MA H394 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include the history of working people and the labor movement in the United States in the public school curriculum. Education.
Title
Relative to teaching the history of working people
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4290 |
2013-05-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4290 (Replaced by) 2014-07-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H394 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H394.pdf |