MA H3993 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the prosecution of persons seeking assistance or treatment for drug related addictions at police stations. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to persons seeking drug addiction treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4625 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-02-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4625 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2992 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4280
H286 (Similar To) 2016-03-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4118
H669 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2873 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H287 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H2992 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4280
H286 (Similar To) 2016-03-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4118
H669 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2873 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H287 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3993 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3993.pdf |