MA H3993 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a Bill establishing a sick leave bank for Brenda Tenaglia an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services of Mass Health (House, No. 3967). October 31, 2017.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Brenda Tenaglia, an employee of the Division of Medical Assistance
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-01 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-11-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-11-22 | House | Enacted |
2017-11-22 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-11-22 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-10-31 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2017-10-31 | House | Substituted for H3967 |
Same As/Similar To
S2054 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2017
S2073 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2017
S2111 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2017
H3943 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3949 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4154 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4239 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
S2073 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2017
S2111 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2017
H3943 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3949 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4139 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4150 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2018
H4141 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4154 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4239 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2018
H4245 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2018
H4403 (Similar To) 2018-08-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2018
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H785 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H55 (Similar To) 2017-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2017
H965 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4919 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4966 (Similar To) 2018-11-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4986
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3993 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3993.pdf |