MA H4070 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to benefits of individuals who have been locked out of their place of employment by their employers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To protect locked out employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2016-05-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H323 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H807 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1211 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1212 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4734 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 451 of the Acts of 2016
H807 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1211 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1212 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4734 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 451 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4070 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4070.pdf |