MA H4094 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kulik of Worthington, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Stephen Kulik, Paul W. Mark and Adam G. Hinds that the treasurer of the Mohawk Trail Regional School District be authorized to invest the Carl H. Nilman Scholarship Trust Fund. Education.
Title
Authorizing the treasurer of the Mohawk Trail Regional School District to invest the Carl H. Nilman Scholarship Trust Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-16 | House | Enacted |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-05-21 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-05-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-04-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-12-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-12-21 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
2017-12-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H292 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
H2859 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2017
H2859 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4094 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4094.pdf |