MA H4102 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4001
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee on Municipalities and Regional Government, reports, on House, No. 4001, a Bill reestablishing a charter for the city of Northampton (House, No. 4102)[Local Approval Received]. May 17, 2012. Michael F. Kane, for the committee.
Title
Reestablishing a charter for the city of Northampton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-09-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-09-04 | House | Enacted |
2012-08-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in the still still further House amendment |
2012-08-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-08-30 | House | House concurred in the still further Senate amendment with a still, still further amendment |
2012-08-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-08-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment with a still further amendment (Rosenberg) |
2012-08-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-08-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment |
2012-08-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-08-16 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2012-08-16 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2416 |
2012-08-16 | Senate | Read third |
2012-07-12 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-05-24 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-05-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-05-17 | House | New draft of H4001 |
2012-05-17 | House | Reported from the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4001 (Replaces) 2012-05-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4102
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4102 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=117882&generalCourtId=1 |