MA H4126 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S633
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the statute of limitations in civil child sexual abuse cases
Title
Extending the statute of limitations in civil child sexual abuse cases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-06-23 | House | Enacted |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-06-23 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed to be engrossed 147 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 394) |
2014-06-18 | House | Read third |
2014-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-06-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-06-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-05-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-05-28 | House | New draft of S633 and H1455 |
2014-05-28 | House | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S633 (Replaces) 2014-05-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4126
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4126 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4126.pdf |