MA H4480 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5027
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a transportation excise tax to be levied on certain businesses. Revenue.
Title
Providing for a transportation excise tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5027 |
2020-07-13 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Revenue |
2020-07-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-13 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2020-02-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/03/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2020-02-28 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2020-02-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/03/2020 from 01:00 AM-03:00 AM in B-2 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5027 (Replaced by) 2020-10-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4480 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4480.pdf |