MA H4926 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4412
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 252 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 252 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To create the Leo M. Birmingham Parkway Trust Fund
Title
To create the Leo M. Birmingham Parkway Trust Fund
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | Rep. Michael Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 252 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-12-21 | House | Enacted |
2020-12-21 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2020-12-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-31 | House | New draft of H4412 |
2020-07-31 | House | Pending new draft of H4412 |
2020-07-31 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4412 (Replaces) 2020-12-10 - New draft substituted, see H4926
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4926 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4926.pdf |