MA H4936 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday January 5, 2021, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday January 5, 2021, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Boston be authorized to grant additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in said city. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday January 5, 2021, pending concurrence |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-03 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4936 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4936.pdf |