MA H705 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4403
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to proof of valid identification at voting polls. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to valid identification at voting polls
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. David Muradian [R] |
Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4403 |
2019-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H633 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H699 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H648 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H649 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2232 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - New draft substituted, see S2344
S2344 (Similar To) 2019-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2019
H4403 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H639
H699 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H648 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H649 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2232 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - New draft substituted, see S2344
S2344 (Similar To) 2019-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2019
H4403 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H705 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H705.pdf |