MA H754 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit certain restrictions on the use of land for agricultural purposes. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To protect farm viability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-19 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 16, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 15, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2013 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in David Prouty High School |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H754 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H754.pdf |